Tuli, Sagun Kaur (CPSO#: 66868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 311
Ocala FL  34478-0311
United States
Phone: 617-584-1969
Fax: (617) 507-3071

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 09 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAGUN KAUR TULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2012