Tuli, Vikas (CPSO#: 70099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
20 Charles Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3V8
Phone: (905) 953-0864
Fax: (905) 953-8405
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikas Tuli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tuli ( CPSO# 70099 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
20 Charles Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3V8
Phone Number: (905) 953-0864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKAS TULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001