Tullis, Diana Elizabeth (CPSO#: 55490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
6 - 049
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5406
Fax: (416) 864-5922
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Elizabeth Tullis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tullis ( CPSO# 55490 )

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
6 - 049
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5406

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA ELIZABETH TULLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULLIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Respiratory Disease

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988