Tulloch-Reid, Desiree Marie Lucette (CPSO#: 83487)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2009