Tumbarello, Roberto (CPSO#: 68687)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:UNIVERSITA DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1996