Tunde-Byass, Modupe Olutoyin Julianah (CPSO#: 74868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 440
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 497-4999
Fax: (416) 497-0011
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Modupe Tunde-Byass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tunde-Byass ( CPSO# 74868 )

Business Address:
Suite 440
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 497-4999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MODUPE OLUTOYIN JULIANAH TUNDE-BYASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNDE-BYASS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004