Tung, Lap Kei Connie (CPSO#: 95564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency Medcine
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Connie Tung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tung ( CPSO# 95564 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAP KEI CONNIE TUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017