Tunzi, Christina Rose (CPSO#: 81055)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Spadina Health Centre
Suite 404
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone: (416) 928-0920
Fax: (416) 928-7426
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9200 Dufferin Street
Unit #2
Concord ON  L4K 0C6
Canada
Phone: (905) 417-3125
Fax: (905) 417-3105
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

249 Marlee Ave
Toronto ON  M6B 4B8
Canada
Phone: (416) 780-9986
Fax: (416) 780-1087
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Oct 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA ROSE TUNZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2006