Turcotte, Marie Laurina (CPSO#: 80885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saint John Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
400 University Avenue
Saint John NB  E2L 4L4
Phone: (506) 648-6000
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.L. Turcotte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE LAURINA TURCOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURCOTTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2015