Tureanu, Luminita Mihaela (CPSO#: 87498)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 28 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010