Turek, Michele Anna (CPSO#: 30114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Medicine
Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8810
Fax: (613) 739-6727
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michele Turek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Turek ( CPSO# 30114 )

Business Address:
Department Of Medicine
Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8810

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 04 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE ANNA TUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUREK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1991