Turineck, David Thomas (CPSO#: 54186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smooth Rock Falls Hospital
Box 219
107 Kelly Road
Smooth Rock Falls ON  P0L 2B0
Phone: (705) 338-2781 Ext. 2139
Fax: (705) 338-2933
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Falls Medical Clinic
107 Kelly Road
Box 219
Smooth Rock Falls ON  P0L 2B0
Canada
Phone: (705) 338-2788
Fax: (705) 338-2933
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Turineck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Turineck ( CPSO# 54186 )

Business Address:
Smooth Rock Falls Hospital
107 Kelly Road
Smooth Rock Falls ON  P0L 2B0
Phone Number: (705) 338-2788

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Smooth Rock Falls Hospital Smooth Rock Falls

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID THOMAS TURINECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURINECK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1985