Turk, Allison Hilary (CPSO#: 59317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Pleasant Family Practice
245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1L2
Phone: (416) 485-7663
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andy Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Turk ( CPSO# 59317 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Bowmanville Site
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Port Perry Site
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON HILARY TURK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1989