Turkistani, Yosra Abdulahad A (CPSO#: 88261)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jun 2008 to 23 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jun 2009 to 08 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Oct 2010 to 08 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Oct 2011 to 08 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016