Turkstra, Ian (CPSO#: 91375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
69 Main Street E.
Grand Bend ON  N0M 1T0
Phone: (519) 238-2362
Fax: (519) 238-6478
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN TURKSTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURKSTRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011