Turley, Conor Benedict (CPSO#: 61883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 511
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 820-2453
Fax: (905) 820-0812
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners Hospitals,
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Division of Plastic Surgery
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 820-2453
Fax: (905) 820-0812
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Conor B. Turley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Turley ( CPSO# 61883 )

Business Address:
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 511
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 820-2453

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONOR BENEDICT TURLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1993