Turley, Jolanda Catherina (CPSO#: 71522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
35 Primrose Avenue East
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone: (613) 230-7788 Ext. 3243
Fax: (613) 230-7778
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOLANDA CATHERINA TURLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1999