Turley, Judith Jean Elizabeth (CPSO#: 24538)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should write to: St. Michaels Hospital Neurophysiology Lab 30 Bond Street Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 16 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 19 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012