Turnbull, John Ross (CPSO#: 62125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
857 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 4T1
Phone: (519) 351-8200
Fax: (519) 351-8118
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Turnbull Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Turnbull ( CPSO# 62125 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
857 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 4T1
Phone Number: (519) 351-8200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROSS TURNBULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNBULL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991