Turner, Andrew Joseph (CPSO#: 55316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 344-4334
Fax: (807) 344-4111
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Turner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Turner ( CPSO# 55316 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 344-4334

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOSEPH TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1995