Turner, Cory Campbell (CPSO#: 59767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 723-8551 Ext. 3553
Fax: (905) 721-3513
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORY CAMPBELL TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1989