Turner, John Charles (CPSO#: 31502)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Alabama
USA - Arkansas
USA - Georgia
USA - Kentucky
USA - Tennessee
USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2016