Turner, Joyce Patricia (CPSO#: 57998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: Willis, Joyce Patricia (used until: 28 Sep 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
109 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone: (905) 628-9200
Fax: (905) 628-9600
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.P. Turner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Turner ( CPSO# 57998 )

Business Address:
109 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone Number: (905) 628-9200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE PATRICIA TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1989