Turner, Katherine Louise (CPSO#: 16348)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1994