Turner, Lary James (CPSO#: 17948)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lary J. Turner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 2010