Turner, Mark Owen (CPSO#: 55822)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2003