Turner, Robert Blair (CPSO#: 68718)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Aug 1996


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Aug 1996