Turner-Gomes, Sophronia Olayemi (CPSO#: 53447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 39555
Lakeshore Cawthra
Mississauga ON  L5G 4S6
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Turner-Gomes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Turner-Gomes ( CPSO# 53447 )

Business Address:
PO Box 39555
Lakeshore Cawthra
Mississauga ON  L5G 4S6

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage and Retrieval Services 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 19 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHRONIA OLAYEMI TURNER-GOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER-GOMES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1983