Turnock, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 66172)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996