Turpie, Irene Drummond (CPSO#: 26199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE DRUMMOND TURPIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURPIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1981