Turton, William Edward (CPSO#: 60893)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1996

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1996

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jun 1994
Summary:

 In a Discipline Hearing which began in May 1994, Dr. Turton pleaded guilty to a charge of 
 professional misconduct, as defined in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that 
 he committed sexual impropriety with a patient.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and 
 in June 1994 found Dr. Turton guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee 
 ordered that Dr. Turton was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
 the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of six months.  The 
 Committee further ruled, however, that the final three months of this suspension would themselves 
 be suspended, provided that Dr. Turton fulfilled the following conditions:

(a)	he was to 
 undertake to embark on a course of psychotherapy geared at understanding the impact of his 
 behaviour on the complainant;

(b)	this psychotherapy was to be provided by a therapist of Dr. 
 Turton's choosing, acceptable to the Registrar; and

(c)	the psychotherapist was to report monthly 
 to the Registrar during the six-month period of suspension, confirming that Dr. Turton was 
 undergoing the stipulated course of treatment.

The Registrar was to determine whether the above 
 terms had been fulfilled.  If Dr. Turton failed to meet these conditions, the latter three months 
 of the suspension were to come into effect immediately following the first three-month period.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 13 Jun 1995
Hearing Date(s): May 16, 1994