Turvey, Erin Anne (CPSO#: 79201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN ANNE TURVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURVEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006