Tuszynska, Hanna Maria (CPSO#: 66934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Spanish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Hospital Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44890
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44890
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
McMaster Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75166
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-1869
Fax: (905) 575-7711
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Tuszynska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Tuszynska ( CPSO# 66934 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Henderson General Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANNA MARIA TUSZYNSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUSZYNSKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1998