Tuters, Laila (CPSO#: 17839)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 May 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Mar 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001