Tweedie, Edward James (CPSO#: 62103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36351
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD JAMES TWEEDIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TWEEDIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1992