Tweedie, Thomas Cameron (CPSO#: 59432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4041
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. C. Tweedie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tweedie ( CPSO# 59432 )

Business Address:
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS CAMERON TWEEDIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TWEEDIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1989