Twemlow, Gregory D'Oyly (CPSO#: 53069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-5511 Ext. 2369
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

51 Adam Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5K3
Canada
Phone: (613) 966-1421
Fax: (613) 966-6068
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY D'OYLY TWEMLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TWEMLOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988