Twum-Barima, David Yaw (CPSO#: 52001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Nov 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: Twum-Barima, Yaw (used until: 13 May 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oakville Medical
Suite 301
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 337-0040
Fax: (905) 337-0044
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Twum-Barima Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Twum-Barima ( CPSO# 52001 )

Business Address:
301 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 294-3010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 09 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID YAW TWUM-BARIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TWUM-BARIMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1987