Tyber, Murray Aaron (CPSO#: 17211)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Tyber 1483 Danforth Avenue Toronto Ontario M4J 1N5
Date Received: 05 Feb 2010

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1959
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1997
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Oct 1991
Summary:

In a decision released in October 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Tyber guilty of 
professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in 
that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the 
Committee imposed the following penalty: 
 
   1. Dr. Tyber was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
      Register. 
 
   2. Imposition of further penalty was to be postponed, on the terms that by 1 March 1992: 
 
      (a) Dr. Tyber was to attend the McMaster PREP and to cooperate in every respect with 
          the assessment provided by that Program. 
 
      (b) Dr. Tyber was to consent to the release by the College to the PREP of any 
          information considered appropriate by the Director of Education of the College 
          prior to the assessment taking place. 
 
      (c) Dr. Tyber was to consent to the release by the PREP to the College of any 
          information with respect to the assessment and the results of the assessment as 
          might be considered necessary by the Director of the Education Department of the 
          College. 
 
      (d) Dr. Tyber was to complete, successfully and to the satisfaction of the Registrar, any 
          period of supervision and any program of upgrading which might be recommended 
          by the PREP, and was to submit himself to such further reassessment or 
          reassessments as might, from time to time, be recommended by the PREP, and was 
          to complete any training, upgrading or period of supervision recommended by the 
          PREP from time to time on the occasion of any reassessment or reassessments 
          which might be recommended. 
 
      (e) Dr. Tyber was promptly to pay to the College the cost of his assessment at the 
          McMaster PREP, as and when invoiced, in an amount to be prescribed by the 
          Registrar of the College, not to exceed $5000.00. 
 
   3. By 1 March 1992, the College was to advise the Chairman of the Discipline Committee 
      whether the terms had been complied with.  If the terms had been complied with, no 
      further penalty was to be imposed.  If they had not, the matter was to be brought before 
      the Committee for consideration of further penalty. 
 
 
On 15 April 1992, the Discipline Committee heard Dr. Tyber s application for variation of 
                                    penalty.  In its Decision and Reasons for Decision 
                                    dated 17 June 1992, the Committee accepted Dr. 
                                    Tyber s application, ordering that he be assessed by 
                                    a university department of rheumatology which 
                                    would be made aware of the concerns as expressed 
                                    in the Decision and Reasons for Decision.  This 
                                    assessment was to be substituted for the PREP 
                                    assessment which the Committee had ordered as 
                                    part of its original decision.  
In November 1997, the Discipline Committee heard a motion to revise the previous orders of the 
Committee. 
 
On reading the Memorandum of Agreement between Dr. Tyber and the College dated March 11, 
1996, and upon reading the submissions of counsel on final disposition, the Discipline 
Committee orders the following terms and conditions be imposed on the certificate of 
registration of Dr. Tyber: 
 
   Dr. Tyber may not perform intra-articular injections, nerve blocks or tendon sheath 
   injections, but may aspirate a joint when medically indicated, for the removal of fluid for the 
   purpose of a culture and sensitivity study. 
 
   The Committee further orders that this order entirely disposes of all current proceedings 
   against Dr. Tyber before the Committee and satisfies all undertakings arising from those 
   proceedings. 
 
 

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 04 Feb 1991