Tyler, Joan Constance (CPSO#: 53046)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joan Tyler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017