Tyler, Melissa Joan (CPSO#: 89038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
102-135 Ormond Street
Brockville ON  K6V 5Y2
Phone: (613)342-2409
Fax: (613)342-8065
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles St.
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: (613)345-5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. M. Tyler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tyler ( CPSO# 88644 )
Dr. M. Tyler ( CPSO# 89038 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-9645

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100


Corporation Name: M. J. Tyler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA JOAN TYLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 09 Feb 2010 to 07 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2011