Tymianski, Michael (CPSO#: 58269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4-435
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5896
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Tymianski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2010


Corporation Name: M. Tymianski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tymianski ( CPSO# 58269 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4 - 435
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5896


Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL TYMIANSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYMIANSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1988