Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tyndel, Milo (CPSO#: 15858)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian

Education:University of Vienna, 1933

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1956 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 01 Jan 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1997