Tyrrell, Allison O'Reta (CPSO#: 82138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11
720 Bristol Road West
Mississauga ON  L5R 4A3
Phone: (905) 507-4432
Fax: (905) 507-8108
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.O. Tyrrell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tyrrell ( CPSO# 82138 )

Business Address:
Unit 11
720 Bristol Road West
Mississauga ON  L5R 4A3
Phone Number: (905) 507-4432

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Mar 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jan 2005 to 14 Mar 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Allison O'Reta Tyrrell may practise medicine independently in paediatrics,
            only.