Tyrrell, Andrew John (CPSO#: 103653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesiology
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 14169
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN TYRRELL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TYRRELL is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. TYRRELL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TYRRELL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. TYRRELL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TYRRELL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TYRRELL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018