Tysdale, Kim Gregory (CPSO#: 58619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
246 Dundas Street South
Cambridge ON  N1R 8A8
Phone: (519) 623-4131
Fax: 519 623 4119
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tysdale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tysdale ( CPSO# 58619 )

Business Address:
246 Dundas Street South
Cambridge ON  N1R 8A8
Phone Number: (519) 623-4131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIM GREGORY TYSDALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYSDALE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1989