Ubhi, Perminder Singh (CPSO#: 53711)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of London, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 04 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2010