Uchida, Hiroyuki (CPSO#: 84377)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Keio Gijuku Daigaku Igakubu, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 May 2006 to 28 Jul 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 May 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2009