Uddin, Abul Hasanat Mohammed Jamal (CPSO#: 22174)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dacca Medical College, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 13 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013