Uddin, Sameena (CPSO#: 79004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 1841
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sameena Uddin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Uddin ( CPSO# 79004 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 06 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEENA UDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2009